ME LD1873 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Align State-funded Benefits with Federal Eligibility Standards
Title
An Act To Align State-funded Benefits with Federal Eligibility Standards
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #636 (Y: 79 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 636 (Yeas 79 - Nays 69 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-18 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative HYMANSON of York the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |