ME LD1864 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Universal Home Care for Seniors and Persons with Disabilities
Title
An Act To Establish Universal Home Care for Seniors and Persons with Disabilities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - Senate - Insist RC #623 (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #559 (Y: 67 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #558 (Y: 68 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #546 (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - Reference To Tax RC #545 (Y: 71 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #559 (Y: 67 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - House - Recede And Concur RC #558 (Y: 68 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #546 (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - Reference To Tax RC #545 (Y: 71 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 623 Yeas 28 - Nays 4 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2018-04-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-03 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2018-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 559 (Yeas 67 - Nays 75 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED. |
2018-04-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 558 (Yeas 68 - Nays 75 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in NON-concurrence |
2018-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 546 (Yeas 72 - Nays 70 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2018-03-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 545 (Yeas 71 - Nays 72 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, to REFER the Bill to the Committee on TAXATION FAILED. |
2018-03-29 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-15 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted to the Clerk of the 128th Maine Legislature by the Secretary of State on March 12, 2018 and ordered printed. |