ME LD1853 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Requiring a Dynamic Fiscal Analysis of Changes to Visual Media Production Tax Credits and Reimbursements
Title
An Act Requiring a Dynamic Fiscal Analysis of Changes to Visual Media Production Tax Credits and Reimbursements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-03 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2014-04-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1853&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1338&item=1&snum=126 |