ME LD185 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Refund the Sales Tax Paid on Fuel Used in Commercial Groundfishing Boats
Title
An Act To Refund the Sales Tax Paid on Fuel Used in Commercial Groundfishing Boats
Sponsors
Rep. Devin Beliveau [D] | Rep. Charles Kruger [D] | Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] | Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] |
Sen. Edward Mazurek [D] | Rep. Jonathan Mckane [R] | Sen. David Trahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (S) On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-87) thereto in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 80 34 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2011-05-17 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-87) thereto | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-87) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-87) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-53). | |
2011-05-17 | (H) On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-53). | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-04-12 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) in concurrence | |
2011-04-07 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-53) | |
2011-04-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-27 | (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |