ME LD1831 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Child and Family Court Process
Title
An Act To Improve the Child and Family Court Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #710 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-629) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-629) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-629) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-629) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-514). |
2022-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-514) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 710 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |