ME LD1818 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Reestablish and Continue the Work of the Criminal Records Review Committee
Title
Resolve, To Reestablish and Continue the Work of the Criminal Records Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #462 (Y: 76 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-872) in concurrence |
2022-03-29 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-872) thereto. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-872) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, House Amendment "A" (H-872) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-782). |
2022-03-24 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-782). |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-782). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) in concurrence |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-782). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-782) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 462 (Yeas 76 - Nays 54 - Absent 18 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-09 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-15 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-15 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 15, 2021. |