ME LD1817 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the State's Adult Use Marijuana Tracking System To Track Plants and Products by Group
Title
An Act To Allow the State's Adult Use Marijuana Tracking System To Track Plants and Products by Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-966), in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-966) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-966). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-15 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 15, 2021. |