ME LD1810 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Expand the Maine Historic Rehabilitation Credit and Establish a Weatherization Tax Credit
Title
An Act to Expand the Maine Historic Rehabilitation Credit and Establish a Weatherization Tax Credit
Sponsors
Rep. Maureen Terry [D] | Rep. Marc Malon [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. Tammy Schmersal-Burgess [R] |
Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #721 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) in concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 721 Yeas 27 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-965). |
2024-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-04-25 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2023-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |