ME LD1804 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Commissioner of Administrative and Financial Services To Sell, Lease or Convey the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Augusta, Bucksport, Limestone, Brookton Township and Rockwood Strip Township
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Commissioner of Administrative and Financial Services To Sell, Lease or Convey the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Augusta, Bucksport, Limestone, Brookton Township and Rockwood Strip Township
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-03-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367). |
2018-03-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-01 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2018-01-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |