ME LD1789 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing Changes to the Ownership and Leases of Certain Public Lands
Title
An Act Authorizing Changes to the Ownership and Leases of Certain Public Lands
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | In accordance with Section 23 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416). |
2018-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-416). |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |