ME LD1765 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Criminal Law Revision Commission
Title
An Act To Establish the Criminal Law Revision Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #663 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hah-741 To Cas-426 RC #572 (Y: 82 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #458 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hah-741 To Cas-426 RC #572 (Y: 82 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #458 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 663 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1765 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 in the Affirmative and 14 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-549) thereto |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-549) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-549) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-549) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of House Amendment "A" (H-741) and INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-426). |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, Under suspension of the Rules, The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-426), in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator FLOOD of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-741) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-741) thereto |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-741) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 572 (Yeas 82 - Nays 52 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-741) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-426). |
2014-03-26 | House | On motion of Representative DION of Portland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-426). |
2014-03-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-21 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2014-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-426). |
2014-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-426) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 23 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 458 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-02-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-11 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2014-02-11 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland for the Criminal Code Revision Planning Committee pursuant to Joint Order 2013, S.P. 31. |