ME LD1761 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (H) (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - (H) (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve and Ensure Adequate Funding for E-9-1-1 Services
Title
An Act To Improve and Ensure Adequate Funding for E-9-1-1 Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | (H) (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) | |
2012-05-16 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 353V 36 having voted in the affirmative and 103 in the negative, with 11 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. | |
2012-05-16 | (H) This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" | |
2012-05-16 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-05-15 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-05-15 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2012-05-15 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-02 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-30 | (S) On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-826), in concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-826) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-826) | |
2012-03-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-01-11 | (S) On motion by Senator Thibodeau of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | |
2012-01-10 | (H) Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |