ME LD1735 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Waive Certain Penalties Imposed against School Administrative Units if the State Has Not Fulfilled Its Goal of Paying 55% of Costs
Title
An Act To Waive Certain Penalties Imposed against School Administrative Units if the State Has Not Fulfilled Its Goal of Paying 55% of Costs
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Beaulieu [R] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Rep. Michael Carey [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] |
Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Rep. Richard Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2010-03-22 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 293 (Yeas 140 - Nays 0 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-18 | (H) This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) in concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) | |
2010-03-11 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |