ME LD1717 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Support Homeless Youth Shelters
Title
Resolve, To Support Homeless Youth Shelters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #527 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #532 (Y: 90 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #444 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #532 (Y: 90 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #444 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2014-04-02 | Senate | ____________________ |
2014-04-02 | Senate | LD 1717 In Senate, April 2, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In the Affirmative and 14 In the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-414). |
2014-03-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-414) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 532 (Yeas 90 - Nays 47 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-414). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-414) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-06 | Senate | 19 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 444 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2014-01-09 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |