ME LD1715 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Prohibiting Teachers, Employees and Other Officials from Engaging in Sexual Activity with Students
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Prohibiting Teachers, Employees and Other Officials from Engaging in Sexual Activity with Students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-270). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-270). |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-270) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |