ME LD171 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide That All Rules Regarding Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Are Major Substantive Rules
Title
An Act to Provide That All Rules Regarding Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances Are Major Substantive Rules
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. James Boyle [D] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] |
Sen. Peter Lyford [R] | Rep. Michael Soboleski [R] | Rep. James Thorne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-04-20 | Joint | Reported Out: LTW |
2023-04-20 | Joint | LTW Approved by Chairs |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |