ME LD1706 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine's Biomass and Forest Products Industries by Allowing Biomass Generators To Enter into Short-term Contracts
Title
An Act To Protect Maine's Biomass and Forest Products Industries by Allowing Biomass Generators To Enter into Short-term Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2012-04-13 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Subsequently, The House ADHERED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 331 (Yeas 61 - Nays 81 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2012-04-13 | (H) The motion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-809) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-539) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-809) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-539) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-12 | (S) (19 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Roll Call Number 469 | |
2012-04-12 | (S) On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo, Senate Amendment "A" (S-539) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-809) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-809) READ. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) PREVAILED | |
2012-04-12 | (S) (19 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Roll Call Number 468 | |
2012-04-12 | (S) On motion by Senator THIBODEAU of Waldo, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2012-04-12 | (S) TAKEN from the Table by the President. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-10 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-09 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-05 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-04 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-03 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-04-02 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-30 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-29 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-28 | (S) (Unfinished Business) | |
2012-03-28 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2012-03-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Representative FITTS of Pittsfield moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-23 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2011. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1706&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1258&item=1&snum=125 |