ME LD1701 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Work-sharing Program To Conform with Federal Law
Title
An Act To Amend the Work-sharing Program To Conform with Federal Law
Sponsors
Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Andrew Mason [D] |
Rep. Diane Russell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-02-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-391). |
2014-02-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-02-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-02-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-391) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-391) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |