ME LD1675 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Definitions in the Laws Regarding the Licensing of Eating Establishments and Lodging Places
Title
An Act To Clarify Definitions in the Laws Regarding the Licensing of Eating Establishments and Lodging Places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-02-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 18, 2017. |