ME LD1666 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Improve the Seed Capital Investment Tax Credit Program
Title
An Act To Improve the Seed Capital Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2010-03-23 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-404) | |
2010-03-17 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-404) | |
2010-03-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-404) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-12-21 | (S) Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 21, 2009 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |