ME LD1632 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Certain Statutory Changes in Light of the New Maine Rules of Unified Criminal Procedure
Title
An Act To Make Certain Statutory Changes in Light of the New Maine Rules of Unified Criminal Procedure
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-565), in concurrence. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-565) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-565) |
2016-03-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2016-03-03 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | Representative FOWLE for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |