ME LD1623 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Further Protect Patient Access to Safe Medical Marijuana by Allowing Dispensaries To Purchase Excess Marijuana from Other Dispensaries
Title
An Act To Further Protect Patient Access to Safe Medical Marijuana by Allowing Dispensaries To Purchase Excess Marijuana from Other Dispensaries
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] |
Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Corey Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-691), in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) |
2014-03-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |