ME LD1618 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Convene a Lobster Industry Working Group
Title
Resolve, to Convene a Lobster Industry Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Cheryl Golek [D] | Rep. Kenneth Davis [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Jauch [D] | Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. James Thorne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Reported Out: LTW |
2023-05-18 | Joint | LTW Approved by Chairs |
2023-04-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-11 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1618&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1043&item=1&snum=131 |