ME LD1615 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Continue the Study of Difficult-to-place Patients
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Continue the Study of Difficult-to-place Patients
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #521 (Y: 8 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2016-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-22 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-398). |
2016-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-398) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-22 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-398) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-398) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 521 Yeas 8 - Nays 26 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to Accept the Minority Ought Not To Pass FAILED |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-03-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-01 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2016-03-01 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported by Senator BRAKEY for the Health and Human Services pursuant to Joint Order 2015, S.P. 631. |