ME LD1607 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Preserve the Integrity of the Maine Certified Public Accountant Examination
Title
An Act To Preserve the Integrity of the Maine Certified Public Accountant Examination
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Robert Hunt [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] |
Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] | Sen. Christopher Rector [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-12-20 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-12-20 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 16, 2011. |