ME LD1601 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish an Advisory Panel To Study the Implications of Genome-editing Technology for the Citizens of the State
Title
Resolve, To Establish an Advisory Panel To Study the Implications of Genome-editing Technology for the Citizens of the State
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Zager [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
Rep. Richard Evans [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Rena Newell [N] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-413). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |