ME LD1564 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Update References to the United States Internal Revenue Code of 1986 Contained in the Maine Revised Statutes
Title
An Act To Update References to the United States Internal Revenue Code of 1986 Contained in the Maine Revised Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - Adopt Hah-515 To Cbs-352 RC #474 (Y: 19 N: 126 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - Adopt Hbh-516 To Cbs-352 RC #473 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #472 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Adopt Hbh-516 To Cbs-352 RC #473 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #472 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-03-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-16 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2016-02-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-09 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-02-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-352) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-516) thereto. |
2016-02-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "B" (S-352) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-516) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-02-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 474 (Yeas 19 - Nays 126 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-09 | House | On motion of Representative MELARAGNO of Auburn, House Amendment "A" (H-515) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-352) was READ and FAILED ADOPTION. |
2016-02-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 473 (Yeas 79 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-09 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING-SPITZ of Orono, House Amendment "B" (H-516) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-352) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-352) was READ. |
2016-02-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-02-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 472 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-09 | House | On motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-351) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-351) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-351) Report ACCEPTED |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-01-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-19 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2016-01-19 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |