ME LD1552 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Improve Employment Opportunities for Maine Workers in the Forest Industry
Title
An Act To Improve Employment Opportunities for Maine Workers in the Forest Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2010-04-08 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers | |
2010-04-08 | (S) RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order HP 1328 in concurrence, on April 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-08 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) On further motion of same Representative, the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) On motion of Representative WATSON of Bath, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1328 on April 7, 2010) | |
2010-03-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 372 19 Yeas - 13 Nays- 2 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 321 (Yeas 70 - Nays 68 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 320 (Yeas 61 - Nays 77 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Motion of Representative COTTA of China to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED. | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) AND House Amendment "B" (H-779) in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (S) 16 Yeas - 18 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2010-03-26 | (S) Motion by Senator COURTNEY of York to Table until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) AND House Amendment "B" (H-779) in concurrence FAILED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 361 | |
2010-03-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-25 | (S) House Amendment "B" (H-779) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-25 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-25 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 356 20 Yeas - 14 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2010-03-25 | (S) Reports READ | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) and House Amendment "B" (H-779). | |
2010-03-25 | (H) On motion of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake, House Amendment "B" (H-779) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) On motion of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake, House Amendment "A" (H-772) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) On motion of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of House Amendment "A" (H-772). | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, Tabled PENDING PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) and House Amendment "A" (H-772). | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On motion of Representative TARDY of Newport, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) and House Amendment "A" (H-772). | |
2010-03-24 | (H) HELD at the Request of Representative TARDY of Newport. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Sent for concurrence. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 304 (Yeas 81 - Nays 64 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) and House Amendment "A" (H-772) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 303 (Yeas 85 - Nays 60 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) On motion of Representative MARTIN of Eagle Lake, House Amendment "A" (H-772) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 299 (Yeas 83 - Nays 58 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Representative TUTTLE of Sanford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-12-21 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-21 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 17, 2009. |