ME LD154 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reform Maine's Motor Vehicle Inspection Guidelines
Title
An Act To Reform Maine's Motor Vehicle Inspection Guidelines
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Rep. Dwayne Prescott [R] |
Rep. Paula Sutton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3, Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2017-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=154&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0112&item=1&snum=128 |