ME LD1532 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine's Air Quality by Strengthening Requirements for Air Emissions Licensing
Title
An Act To Protect Maine's Air Quality by Strengthening Requirements for Air Emissions Licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-01-10 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-01-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 15, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1532&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1136&item=1&snum=130 |