ME LD1530 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Patients by Permitting On-site Consumption of Medical Cannabis and Medical Cannabis Products
Title
An Act to Support Patients by Permitting On-site Consumption of Medical Cannabis and Medical Cannabis Products
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Supica [D] | Rep. David Boyer [R] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] |
Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-02-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1530&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0985&item=1&snum=131 |