ME LD1520 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create and Sustain Jobs and Encourage Affordable Housing through Development of Cooperatives and Employee-owned Businesses
Title
An Act To Create and Sustain Jobs and Encourage Affordable Housing through Development of Cooperatives and Employee-owned Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-260). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-260). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-260) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed |