ME LD1487 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure That Residents of the State Have the Right to Repair Their Own Electronic Devices
Title
An Act to Ensure That Residents of the State Have the Right to Repair Their Own Electronic Devices
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Tipping [D] | Rep. David Boyer [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Sally Cluchey [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Jauch [D] | Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Rep. Amy Roeder [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-686 RC #702 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #701 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #701 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2024-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2024-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-615) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-686) thereto |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-615) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-686) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 702 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-686) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-615) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-615) READ |
2024-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 701 Yeas 33 - Nays 1 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-27 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |