ME LD1487 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Fiscal Predictability to the MaineCare Program and Health Security to Maine People
Title
An Act To Provide Fiscal Predictability to the MaineCare Program and Health Security to Maine People
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] |
Sen. Richard Woodbury [D] | Rep. Kathleen Chase [R] | Rep. Lance Harvell [R] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-11 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #572 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #537 (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #448 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #537 (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #448 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2014-04-11 | Senate | ____________________ |
2014-04-11 | Senate | LD 1487 In Senate, April 11, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 In the Affirmative and 13 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2014-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-19 | House | RELEASED. |
2014-03-18 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative POULIOT of Augusta. |
2014-03-18 | House | In concurrence. |
2014-03-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-419). |
2014-03-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-419) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 537 (Yeas 97 - Nays 49 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-18 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-419) thereto |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-419) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-419) Report ACCEPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 448 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-12 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order . |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to COMMITTING Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President Pro Tem. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending the motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc to INSIST to COMMITTING Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Health and Human Services.. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec, the Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Senate INSISTED to COMMITTING Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Health and Human Services.. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to COMMITTING Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2013-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin, Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-01 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |