ME LD1483 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Maine's Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
An Act To Amend Maine's Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-13 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-512) thereto |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-12 | Senate | PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-512) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-512) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-512) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby House Amendment "A" (H-537) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) was ADOPTED and INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto was ADOPTED |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-367). As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-10 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto in concurrence |
2016-03-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-08 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-03-08 | House | The Bill was PASSEDTO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto. |
2016-03-08 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-03-03 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-537) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham House Amendment "A" (H-537) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) was READ. |
2016-03-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-03 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-03 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative McLEAN of Gorham REMOVED. |
2016-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-367). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-367) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |