ME LD1477 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Finance Authority of Maine To Oversee an Obligation Owed to the State by Lincoln Paper and Tissue, LLC
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Finance Authority of Maine To Oversee an Obligation Owed to the State by Lincoln Paper and Tissue, LLC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-03 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-257). | |
2009-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2009-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-257) (Remarks Made) | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-257) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-05-07 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Schneider of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Committee on Business, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |