ME LD1468 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Maine Uniform Directed Trust Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Maine Uniform Directed Trust Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carpenter of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2019-04-02 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-02 | House | Representative BAILEY for the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 18-A, section 1-803, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |