ME LD1464 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Support Electrification of Certain Technologies for the Benefit of Maine Consumers and Utility Systems and the Environment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Support Electrification of Certain Technologies for the Benefit of Maine Consumers and Utility Systems and the Environment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-477) in concurrence
2019-06-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-477) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-10SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-10SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-10SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-07SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-06-07SenateSenator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-06-07SenateReports READ
2019-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-477).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-477) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-06HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback