ME LD1460 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - LD 1460 In Senate, March 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - LD 1460 In Senate, March 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 301: Fee Schedule and Administrative Procedures for Payment of Commission Assigned Counsel, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Commission on Indigent Legal Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 301: Fee Schedule and Administrative Procedures for Payment of Commission Assigned Counsel, a Major Substantive Rule of the Maine Commission on Indigent Legal Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #559 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #477 (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #477 (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | LD 1460 In Senate, March 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2016-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 477V 136 having voted in the affirmative and 9 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-02-23 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-02-23 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-02-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-02-18 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-02-18 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan the Resolve was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-01-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2016-01-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2016-01-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-01-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-12-08 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2015-12-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 4, 2015. |
2015-12-08 | House | Reported by Representative HOBBINS for the Maine Commission on Indigent Legal Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072. |