ME LD1454 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence (Remarks Made)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence (Remarks Made)
Summary
An Act To Provide Additional Unemployment Benefits and Make Statutory Revisions in Accordance with the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009
Title
An Act To Provide Additional Unemployment Benefits and Make Statutory Revisions in Accordance with the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence (Remarks Made) | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 27 (Yeas 139 - Nays 1 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) | |
2009-04-16 | (H) This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-63). | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Senate Amendment "A" (S-63) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Under suspension of the rules and WITHOUT REFERENCE to a Committee, the Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-63) | |
2009-04-14 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-63) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-04-14 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-14 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-09 | (S) READ ONCE without reference to a Committee | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Senator JACKSON of Aroostook asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to REFER to the Committee on Labor | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-04-09 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to REFER to the Committee on Labor | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Senator JACKSON of Aroostook moved to REFER to the Committee on LABOR | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Committee on Labor suggested and ordered printed. |