ME LD1433 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-352), in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-352) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-352). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |