ME LD1392 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Mazurek [D] | Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] |
Rep. Christine Powers [D] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] | Rep. Lisa Villa [D] | Rep. Russell Werts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox taken from the Special Highway Table |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-133). |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-133) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-10 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |