ME LD1381 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Sales Tax Holiday To Help Maine Businesses Affected by the COVID-19 Pandemic
Title
An Act To Establish a Sales Tax Holiday To Help Maine Businesses Affected by the COVID-19 Pandemic
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Laurel Libby [R] |
Rep. Sawin Millett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #380 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #278 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #278 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 380 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 278 (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-05 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 5, 2021. |