ME LD1373 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-13 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-13 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Increase the Safety of Maine State Troopers
Title
An Act To Increase the Safety of Maine State Troopers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-13 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2009-06-02 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-322) in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-322) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-27 | (S) On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-322) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-322) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-322) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 98 (Yeas 142 - Nays 1 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-21 | (H) On motion of Representative HASKELL of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |