ME LD1371 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Nondiscriminatory Treatment of Public, Educational and Governmental Access Channels by Cable System Operators
Title
An Act To Ensure Nondiscriminatory Treatment of Public, Educational and Governmental Access Channels by Cable System Operators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-29 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-29 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-28 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2019-05-28 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report, |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |