ME LD1347 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - LD 1347In Senate, June 15, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - LD 1347In Senate, June 15, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee To Clarify That Competitive Bid Provisions Apply to Grant Awards
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Government Oversight Committee To Clarify That Competitive Bid Provisions Apply to Grant Awards
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #233 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #246 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #246 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | LD 1347In Senate, June 15, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 246V 144 having voted in the affirmative and 2 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-15 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read Once |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Katz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-16 | House | Representative KRUGER for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 997, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |