ME LD1341 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Eligibility for Unemployment Benefits during Labor Disputes
Title
An Act To Clarify Eligibility for Unemployment Benefits during Labor Disputes
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] |
Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #291 (Y: 78 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #273 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-09 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #273 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) |
2017-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 291 (Yeas 78 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 273 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |