ME LD1340 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Criminal History Record Checks for All Prospective and Current Staff Members of the Office of the State Auditor
Title
An Act To Require Criminal History Record Checks for All Prospective and Current Staff Members of the Office of the State Auditor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-420), in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-420) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-420). |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |