ME LD1339 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Relief to Maine Ratepayers
Title
An Act To Provide Relief to Maine Ratepayers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #541 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #568 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #568 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2016-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate ADHERED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-03-31 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 541 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-424) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 568 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator WOODSOME of York to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senator WOODSOME of York moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-04-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Woodsome of York REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2015-04-14 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |