ME LD1309 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Clean Election Act
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Clean Election Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #327 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-186 To Cas-156 RC #262 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #261 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-186 To Cas-156 RC #262 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #261 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order . |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-156). |
2013-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-156) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 327 (Yeas 84 - Nays 55 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-14 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-13 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-13 | House | Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-156). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-156) ADOPTED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (15 -Yeas, 20 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Number 262 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-186) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-156) READ and FAILED ADOPTION. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-156) READ. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (26 -Yeas, 9 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Number 261 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-31 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-31 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Senator TUTTLE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |